Global Patent Index - EP 1008684 A1

EP 1008684 A1 2000-06-14 - Method of manufacturing a non-woven felt for use in cue sports and gaming tables and a non-woven felt thus obtained

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a non-woven felt for use in cue sports and gaming tables and a non-woven felt thus obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Vliesstoffs für Billard- und Spieltische und ein mit diesem Verfahren hergestellter Vliesstoff

Title (fr)

Méthode de fabrication d'un feutre non-tissé utilisé pour les tables de billard et pour les tables de jeux et feutre non-tissé ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1008684 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99309756 A

Priority

GB 9827042 A

Abstract (en)

A method of manufacturing a non-woven felt for use as a covering cloth for cue sports or gaming tables which comprises the following steps: a) providing a non-woven web of fibres, the web including feltable fibres; b) needlefelting the web of fibres to produce a non-woven felt; and c) milling the non-woven felt. The invention further relates to a non-woven felt obtained according to the above method and to the use of such non-woven felt in the manufacture of cue sports or gaming tables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4266 (2012.01); D04H 1/4334 (2012.01); D04H 1/46 (2012.01); D04H 5/02 (2012.01); D04H 11/08 (2006.01); D04H 17/00 (2006.01); D04H 18/00 (2012.01); A63D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/4334 (2013.01); D04H 1/4266 (2013.01); D04H 1/46 (2013.01); D04H 5/02 (2013.01); D04H 11/08 (2013.01); D04H 17/00 (2013.01); D04H 18/00 (2013.01); A63D 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008684 A1 20000614; GB 9827042 D0 19990203

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI