Global patent index - EP 1008690 A2

EP 1008690 A2 2000-06-14 - Process and apparatus for making a paperweb

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for making a paperweb

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication d' une bande de papier

Publication

EP 1008690 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123338 A

Priority

DE 19856277 A

Abstract (en)

In the papermaking machine, at the output section (3) of the machine, there is a cutting assembly (4), splitting the band into longitudinal strips. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding method of manufacture. Preferred features: A turning equipment (5) follows the cutter, changing the direction of the product, essentially within the plane of the web (2). The output direction of the turning system can be altered. Following the paper strip (A-D) separation and the turning system, there are different types of improvement units (12-17) falling into groups (12-14; 15, 16) which operate in different directions. There is one further group of improvement units (17). Adjacent groups include angles of 90 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Papierbahn (2) angegeben mit einer Papiermaschine (1) und mindestens einer Veredelungsvorrichtung (12-17). Bei der Papierherstellung möchte man die Flexibilität erhöhen können. Hierzu ist am Ausgang (3) der Papiermaschine (1) eine Längsschneideeinrichtung (4) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00; D21G 1/00; D21G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008690 A2 20000614; EP 1008690 A3 20050309; DE 19856277 C1 20000621; US 6391157 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status

2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2005-04-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STORA ENSO PUBLICATION PAPER AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI