Global Patent Index - EP 1008694 A2

EP 1008694 A2 2000-06-14 - Sanitary arrangement

Title (en)

Sanitary arrangement

Title (de)

Sanitäre Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Ensemble sanitaire

Publication

EP 1008694 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122358 A

Priority

DE 29821964 U

Abstract (en)

The toilet equipment (1) is designed as a transportable unit (5). Preferably the unit comprises at least one sanitary module which can be filled or flushed with water. It particularly includes a wash basin (25), it also includes a toilet, a bidet or urinal, a shower tray or a bath.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine sanitäre Einrichtung, die an einer Wand und/oder auf dem Boden angeordnet ist, mit einer einen Wasserzulauf und Wasserablauf aufweisenden Sanitärinstallation. Es ist vorgesehen, dass die sanitäre Einrichtung als transportable Einheit ausgebildet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/32 (2006.01); E03D 11/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/32 (2013.01); E03D 11/135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821964 U1 19990204; EP 1008694 A2 20000614; EP 1008694 A3 20010307

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030620

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI