Global patent index - EP 1008695 A1

EP 1008695 A1 2000-06-14 - Water fitting

Title (en)

Water fitting

Title (de)

Wasserarmatur

Title (fr)

Armature d'eau

Publication

EP 1008695 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123733 A

Priority

DE 19856553 A

Abstract (en)

The hollow housing (1) has two pipes (10,11) at right angles to one another, each pipe with an opening and with a holder in pipe (10) serving as stand socket on the tapboard (7) so an insert (3) fitted to the holder can connect a valve cartridge (4) in the opening of the pipe (11). A holder ring part (20) has an arc of 90-140 degrees and is so fixed to the housing that its two ends each have tendon-type U-straps parallel to the center axis terminating in right angled tabs used to fix the insert in place. Each tab is tapped for a screw homing into the insert in each case. The relatively thin circular insert plate has respective cold, hot and mixed water openings and is tapped in its endface for valve cartridge clamping screws of the valve cartridge taking the mixer tap.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Wasserarmatur mit einem Hohlgehäuse (1), in dem wenigstens ein Ventileinsatz mit wenigstens jeweils einem Anschluß für das zufließende Kalt- und/oder Warmwasser gehalten ist, wobei das Hohlgehäuse an einer Armaturenbank (7) eines Waschbeckens oder dergleichen befestigbar ist, ist zur Verbesserung vorgeschlagen, daß das Hohlgehäuse wenigstens zwei im Winkel von 90° zueinander angeordnete Stutzen (10,11) mit jeweils einer Öffnung (100,110) aufweist, wobei im Innenbereich des einen Stutzens (10), der als Standsockel auf der Armaturenbank dient, ein Halter (2) befestigt ist, an dem ein Einsatzstück (3) für den Anschluß einer Ventilkartusche (4) in der Öffnung des anderen Stutzens (11) anzuordnen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 11/07 (2006.01); E03C 1/04 (2006.01); F16K 11/078 (2006.01); F16K 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/9464 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3120210 A1 19821209 - GROHE ARMATUREN FRIEDRICH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008695 A1 20000614; DE 19856553 A1 20000615; ES 1044767 U 20000601; ES 1044767 Y 20001016; JP 2000170930 A 20000623; US 6289531 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030531

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRIEDRICH GROHE AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI