Global patent index - EP 1008697 A2

EP 1008697 A2 2000-06-14 - Heat and/or sound insulating element

Title (en)

Heat and/or sound insulating element

Title (de)

Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmelement

Title (fr)

Elément d'isolation thermique et/ou phonique

Publication

EP 1008697 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124164 A

Priority

DE 19857383 A

Abstract (en)

At least one edge surface (6) of the hard-foam plate (2) is provided with a strip (7) of incombustible insulating material which extends over the entire length of this surface.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmelement mit Brandschutzfunktion, bestehend aus einer Hartschaumplatte (2), welche Hartschaumplatte (2) auf einer zu dämmenden Fläche, mit Klebern und/oder Halteelementen befestigbar und für den Auftrag eines Putzes (4, 5) geeignet ist, wobei die Hartschaumplatte (2) zwei parallel zueinander angeordnete große Oberflächen (8) und vier an die großen Oberflächen (8) im wesentlichen rechtwinklig angrenzende Seitenflächen (6) aufweist. Um ein derartiges Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmelement mit Brandschutzfunktion derart weiterzuentwickeln, daß die schnelle Brandausdehnungen über Gebäudeöffnungen in den Fassadenbereich verhindert wird, ist vorgesehen, daß an zumindest einer Seitenfläche (6) der Hartschaumplatte (2) ein Streifen (7) eines nicht brennbaren Dämmstoffs angeordnet ist, der sich über die gesamte Länge der Seitenfläche (6) erstreckt und daß die der zu dämmenden Fläche zugewandte große Oberfläche (8) der Hartschaumplatte (2) randseitig eine Ausnehmung (19) aufweist, in die ein Streifen (22) eines nicht brennbaren Dämmaterials unter Zwischenlage eines Profilelementes (21) einlegbar ist und daß das Profilelement (21) im Querschnitt L-förmig ausgebildet ist, wobei der eine Schenkel (20) zwischen dem Streifen (22) und der Hartschaumplatte (2) und der zweite Schenkel (24) die Schmalseite (6) der Hartschaumplatte (2) abdeckend angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/88; E04B 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/765 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04B 1/941 (2013.01); E04B 1/94 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008697 A2 20000614; EP 1008697 A3 20020925; EP 1008697 B1 20040818; DE 19860974 C1 20011220

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150122 AND 20150128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020824

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04B 1/88 A, 7E 04B 1/94 B, 7E 04B 1/76 B

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI