Global Patent Index - EP 1008697 A3

EP 1008697 A3 2002-09-25 - Heat and/or sound insulating element

Title (en)

Heat and/or sound insulating element

Title (de)

Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmelement

Title (fr)

Elément d'isolation thermique et/ou phonique

Publication

EP 1008697 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124164 A

Priority

DE 19857383 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1008697A2] At least one edge surface (6) of the hard-foam plate (2) is provided with a strip (7) of incombustible insulating material which extends over the entire length of this surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/88; E04B 1/76; E04B 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/765 (2013.01); E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04B 1/941 (2013.01); E04B 1/94 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008697 A2 20000614; EP 1008697 A3 20020925; EP 1008697 B1 20040818; DE 19860974 C1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161203

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161203

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151202

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20150122 AND 20150128

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910267 P 20040923

2004-09-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020824

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/88 A, 7E 04B 1/94 B, 7E 04B 1/76 B

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI