Global Patent Index - EP 1008698 A2

EP 1008698 A2 2000-06-14 - Shell wall with fireproofing and sound insulating properties

Title (en)

Shell wall with fireproofing and sound insulating properties

Title (de)

Bauvorsatzschale mit Feuerschutz-Schallschutz-Eigenschaften

Title (fr)

Paroi de doublage ayant des propriétés ignifuges et insonorisantes

Publication

EP 1008698 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122620 A

Priority

DE 29821741 U

Abstract (en)

The shell has a grid (2) of parallel sections and support profiles (5) parallel to these. The support profiles (5) are each coated on the outside with fireproof plates (9,10,11) and fireproof strips (13) extend between all the support profile sections (5). The fireproof plates are fixed on the support profiles and the strips on the base profiles (3,4). Sound-absorbing perforated plates (19) are placed in front of the support profile sections (5). Mineral fibre layers can be provided between the fireproof and sound absorbing plates.

Abstract (de)

Es gibt eine Bauvorsatzschale mit Feuerschutz- und Schallschutz-Eigenschaften, bei der ein Gitter aus zueinander parallelen Grundprofilen 3, 4, denen Gitteranbringungsmittel zugeordnet sind, und zueinander parallelen Tragprofilen 5, die den Grundprofilen vorgesetzt und an diesen festgelegt sind, besteht und bei der Plattenelemente 19 den Tragprofilen 5 vorgesetzt und an diesen festgelegt sind und Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial vorgesehen ist. Dabei ist es erwünscht, wenn unter Wahrung von befriedigenden Feuerschutz-Eigenschaften die Schallschutz-Eigenschaften verbessert sind. Dies ist erreicht, indem die Tragprofile 5 jeweils an der Außenseite mit Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial-Stücken 9, 10, 11 bemantelt 8 sind und zwischen allen Tragprofilen 5, sich von Tragprofil zu Tragprofil erstreckend, den Grundprofilen 3, 4 Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial-Streifen 13 vorgesetzt sind, wobei die Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial-Stücke 9, 10, 11 an den Tragprofilen 5 und die Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial-Streifen an den Grundprofilen 3, 4 festgelegt sind, und indem die den Tragprofilen 5 vorgesetzten Plattenelemente Schallschutz-Lochplatten 19 sind. Es sind durch die vorgesetzten Lochplatten die Schallschutz-Eigenschaften befriedigend; das Feuerschutz-Plattenmaterial ummantelt die Tragprofile und ist im übrigen zu den Grundprofilen zurückverlegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/94; E04B 1/82; E04B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/02 (2006.01); E04B 9/24 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0867 (2013.01); E04B 9/02 (2013.01); E04B 9/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821741 U1 19990218; AT 4079 U1 20010125; BG 103951 U 20000630; BG 524 Y1 20020430; BR 7903190 U 20000926; EP 1008698 A2 20000614; EP 1008698 A3 20010808; HR P990370 A2 20001031; HU 1982 U 20010328; HU 9900306 V0 20000228; PL 110354 U1 20000619; TR 9902968 U 20000721

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-10-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: WALL CLADDING WITH FIREPROOFING AND SOUND INSULATING PROPERTIES

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

2002-05-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20011029;LV PAYMENT 20011029;RO PAYMENT 20011029;SI PAYMENT 20011029

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011029

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI