Global Patent Index - EP 1008699 A1

EP 1008699 A1 2000-06-14 - Building element for construction of floors

Title (en)

Building element for construction of floors

Title (de)

Bauelement zum Aufbau von Gebäudedecken

Title (fr)

Elément de construction pour la réalisation de planchers

Publication

EP 1008699 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122268 A

Priority

DE 29821755 U

Abstract (en)

First double T-supports (1, 2) with their abutting head parts (6) form a ready upper side whilst second double T-supports (3, 4) with their correspondingly abutting head parts form a ready under side of the structural component. The double T-supports are of wood. A mass is used to fill the free spaces between the double T-supports. The filling mass is heat and/or fire and/or sound-insulating. It consists of a granulate which after filling is bound with cement. It comprises brick and/or paper and/or wood and/or straw and/or wool and/or other natural and artificial material.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Bauelement (5) zum Aufbau von Gebäudedecken, wie Keller-, Trenn- und Dachdecken, aus mehreren gleichartigen Bauelementen, das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß das Bauelement für sich aus mehreren gleichartigen Doppel-T-Trägern (1,2) zusammengesetzt ist, wobei jeder Doppel-T-Träger (1,2) aus einem breiteren Kopfteil (6) und einem vergleichsweise schmaleren Fußteil (7) besteht, die durch einen Mittelsteg (8) voneinander auf Abstand gehalten sind, und erste Doppel-T-Träger (1,2) mit ihren aneinandergrenzenden Kopfteilen (6) eine fertige Oberseite bilden, während zweite Doppel-T-Träger (1,2) mit ihren entsprechend aneinandergrenzenden Kopfteilen (6) eine fertige Unterseite des Bauelementes (5) bilden und die beiderseitigen Stege (8) der Doppel-T-Träger mit ihren angrenzenden Fußteilen (7) untereinander und von den Kopfteilen (6) jeweils auf das Verfüllen der freien Räume (14,15,16) zwischen den Doppel-T-Trägern (1,2) mit einer Füllmasse erlaubende Abstände gehalten sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/12; E04B 1/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/12 (2006.01); E04B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/12 (2013.01); E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E04B 2005/235 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821755 U1 19990318; AT 247752 T 20030915; EP 1008699 A1 20000614; EP 1008699 B1 20030820

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2004-12-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041201

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906666 P 20030925

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-08-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030820

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI