Global patent index - EP 1008701 A1

EP 1008701 A1 2000-06-14 - Cap

Title (en)

Cap

Title (de)

Kappe

Title (fr)

Manchon

Publication

EP 1008701 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99660188 A

Priority

FI 980540 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a cap for sealing lead-throughs made for pipes and other tubular elements penetrating roof coverings. Such a cap usually comprises a flange section (1, 13) and a sleeve (4, 14) arranged to protrude from the flange section. It is intended particularly for sealing lead-throughs which are situated in steep roofs or which become wider above the roof. The flange section is arranged to surround the sleeve (4) that tapers off at its end, and the sleeve is mounted in the flange section by means of deep corrugations (5) extending in opposite directions. Such corrugations enable sharp turning of the sleeve with respect to the flange section without any tearing of the sleeve. Therefore the invention is applicable for use at any roof pitch and with any diameter of a lead-through. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1475 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008701 A1 20000614; FI 3983 U1 19990615; FI 980540 U0 19981208

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050610

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041129

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALLOX OY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI