Global Patent Index - EP 1008707 A2

EP 1008707 A2 2000-06-14 - A fencing post

Title (en)

A fencing post

Title (de)

Zaunpfosten

Title (fr)

Poteau de clôture

Publication

EP 1008707 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309953 A

Priority

GB 9827326 A

Abstract (en)

A fencing post (10) comprises two extruded plastics material outer members (12) which are joined together by a double 'L' steel section member (14) to define two slots (16, 18) adapted to receive the ends of each one of a pair of fencing panels (not shown). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/16 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/20 (2013.01); E04H 17/168 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008707 A2 20000614; EP 1008707 A3 20020130; GB 2344603 A 20000614; GB 2344603 B 20030122; GB 9827326 D0 19990203

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 17/20 A, 7E 04H 17/16 B, 7E 04C 3/29 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI