Global Patent Index - EP 1008708 A1

EP 1008708 A1 2000-06-14 - A device for controlling the movement of handles for door and window frames

Title (en)

A device for controlling the movement of handles for door and window frames

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Bewegung eines Griffes für Tür- oder Fensterrahmen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de mouvement d'une poignée pour châssis de porte ou de fenêtre

Publication

EP 1008708 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99117076 A

Priority

IT PD980288 A

Abstract (en)

A description is given of a device for controlling the movement of a handle (30) for door and window frames, which handle is mounted to rotate together with a prismatic pin (27) coupled to a bolt (29). A prismatic element (18) has a central seat (19) suitable for receiving the pin (27) in order to rotate together therewith, and a plurality of flat outer thrust surfaces (20) suitable for cooperating with a pair of sliders (22) urged resiliently in order to bring about a corresponding plurality of stable configurations in each of which the bolt (29) is in a locking position, and the handle (30) is in one of a plurality of corresponding angularly spaced stable release positions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/065 (2013.01); E05B 15/0013 (2013.01); E05B 15/0053 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008708 A1 20000614; IT 1302755 B1 20000929; IT PD980288 A1 20000612

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030919

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20001211

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI