Global Patent Index - EP 1008709 A1

EP 1008709 A1 2000-06-14 - Lock and escutcheon assembly with a sealing member between the lock and the door

Title (en)

Lock and escutcheon assembly with a sealing member between the lock and the door

Title (de)

Schloss- und Türschildsystem mit einem Dichtungselement zwischen dem Schloss und der Tür

Title (fr)

Système à serrure et rosette avec un élément d'étanchéité entre la serrure et la porte

Publication

EP 1008709 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204202 A

Priority

NL 1010760 A

Abstract (en)

Sealing member (6,16) to be arranged between the projecting part (4,14) of a lock which has been placed in a door (1) or the like and the edge of the opening in said door. The sealing member (6,16) is clamped between the cover plate (2,11) and the door (1) and prevents moisture from penetrating into the door (1) via the opening for the projecting part (4,14) of the lock.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 17/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008709 A1 20000614; NL 1010760 C2 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050120

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI