Global Patent Index - EP 1008710 A1

EP 1008710 A1 2000-06-14 - Lock fitting of the espagnolette type

Title (en)

Lock fitting of the espagnolette type

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag mit Treibstangen

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone

Publication

EP 1008710 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440332 A

Priority

FR 9815631 A

Abstract (en)

The lock assembly consists of a housing (2) with an operating mechanism for rods connected to the espagnolette bolts, and a nut (6) with a square aperture for a handle shank. It has a sectional and/or pivoted locking member to allow the nut to be prevented temporarily from rotating, set in a recess (15) in one wall (16) of the housing and made in the form of a retaining tongue (17) engaging with a lug (18).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone (1), comprenant un boîtier (2) accueillant un mécanisme d'entraînement (3) pour la commande en déplacement d'au moins une tringle de manoeuvre (4, 5), comportant au moins un fouillot (6) présentant un moyeu (7) pourvu d'une ouverture (8) pour la réception du carré de manoeuvre d'une poignée ou d'un bouton de commande, ledit boîtier (2) comportant un organe de blocage (14) sécable et/ou escamotable, pour immobiliser temporairement en rotation le fouillot (6). Avantageusement, cet organe (14) sécable et/ou escamotable est ménagé au niveau d'une découpe (15) réalisée dans une des parois (16) du boîtier (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00; E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 17/0012 (2013.01); E05B 15/0053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008710 A1 20000614; EP 1008710 B1 20060531; DE 69931585 D1 20060706; DE 69931585 T2 20070222; FR 2786803 A1 20000609; FR 2786803 B1 20010511

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081201

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69931585

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060821

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69931585 P 20060706

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040622

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI