Global Patent Index - EP 1008714 A1

EP 1008714 A1 2000-06-14 - Security hinge, especially for vehicle armrest

Title (en)

Security hinge, especially for vehicle armrest

Title (de)

Sicherheitsscharnier, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeugarmlehne

Title (fr)

Charnière de sécurité, notamment pour accoudoir de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1008714 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403072 A

Priority

FR 9815464 A

Abstract (en)

The safety hinge, having a first axis of rotation (6) between fixed and moving sections of an arm rest and a stop to limit the movement, incorporates an intermediate component (5) which pivots relative to one of the sections and has a bearing (7) for a second axis of rotation for the other section. The second axis has a contact position and elastic elements (12) to press a thrust member (11) against it.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une charnière de sécurité, comprenant un premier axe de rotation (6) sur lequel une pièce mobile (3) est montée sur une pièce fixe (1) pour pivoter par rapport à cette dernière, et une butée pour limiter le mouvement de pivotement relatif de ces pièces. Cette charnière comprend une pièce intermédiaire (5) entre les pièces fixe et mobile, la pièce intermédiaire étant montée pivotante sur une des pièces fixe et mobile autour du premier axe et comportant au moins un palier (7) pour recevoir un deuxième axe de rotation (8) autour duquel l'autre des pièces fixe et mobile est montée pivotante sur la pièce intermédiaire, ce deuxième axe de rotation comportant un emplacement de contact (9) tel qu'un méplat, et des moyens élastiques (12) étant agencés pour presser un organe de poussée (11) contre cet emplacement de contact. Application notamment aux accoudoirs de véhicule automobile. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/12 (2013.01); E05D 11/105 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008714 A1 20000614; FR 2786804 A1 20000609; FR 2786804 B1 20040514

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI