Global Patent Index - EP 1008722 A1

EP 1008722 A1 2000-06-14 - Method for manufacturing a welded turbomachine rotor

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a welded turbomachine rotor

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geschweissten Rotors einer Strömungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication par soudage d'un rotor de turbomachine

Publication

EP 1008722 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811218 A

Priority

EP 98811218 A

Abstract (en)

Two adjoining rotor disks (1,2) are welded together along a seam (3) running from hollow channel (5) closed by the two disks towards the rotor axis. On its outside periphery (6) furthest from the rotor the channel (5) lies open and both disks enclose a gap (7) which adjoins the channel directly on the non-rotor side to accept a two-part ring element (8). The parts of the ring are welded to each other at their abutment and also to the adjoining rotor disks preferably by electronbeam welding. A relief groove is worked into the seam to relieve its loading and a centering rib worked into each weld point projects on the seam surface of both parts not divided by the weld seam.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben werden zwei Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geschweißten Rotors einer Strömungsmaschine, der durch rotorinterne Zu- und Abströmungskanäle von einem Kühlmedium durchströmt wird und aus mehreren Rotorscheiben zusammengesetzt ist, die durch radial oder weitgehend radial zur Rotorachse verlaufende Schweißnähte miteinander verbunden werden und jeweils einen um die Rotorachse verlaufenden Hohlkanal miteinander einschließen, der die Schweißnähte derart unterbricht, daß eine rotorseitig zugewandte Schweißnaht unmittelbar an den Hohlkanal angrenzt. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß zwei unmittelbar aneinandergrenzende Rotorscheiben entlang wenigstens einer Naht, die sich ausgehend von dem Hohlkanal, der von beiden Rotorscheiben eingeschlossen wird, in Richtung Rotorachse erstreckt, miteinander verschweißt werden, daß der rotorseitig abgewandte Bereich des Hohlkanals an seiner peripheren Außenseite wenigstens teilweise offen ausgebildet ist und daß beide Rotorscheiben einen Spalt einschließen, der sich rotorseitig abgewandt unmittelbar an den Hohlkanal anschließt und in den ein, aus wenigstens zwei Teilelementen bestehendes Ringelement eingebracht wird, und daß die Teilelemente des Ringelementes an ihren gegenüberliegenden Stoßflächen miteinander sowie mit Ihren Seitenflanken an den diesen gegenüberliegenden Rotorscheiben verfügt werden. Das andere erfindungsgemäße Verfahren sieht die Verwendung eines einteiligen Rings vor, der auch mit konventionellen Schweißtechniken zum Abschluß des Hohlkanals verschweißt werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/063 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4932 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49321 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49323 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49325 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0844367 A1 19980527 - ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008722 A1 20000614; EP 1008722 B1 20030910; DE 59809583 D1 20031016; EP 1342882 A2 20030910; EP 1342882 A3 20040506; EP 1342882 B1 20060517; US 2002092165 A1 20020718; US 2003084568 A1 20030508; US 6519849 B2 20030218; US 6687994 B2 20040210

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59809583

2016-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809583

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59809583

- Representative's name: RUEGER, BARTHELT & ABEL, DE

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-02-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-01-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809583 P 20031016

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020716

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI