Global Patent Index - EP 1008723 A1

EP 1008723 A1 2000-06-14 - Platform cooling in turbomachines

Title (en)

Platform cooling in turbomachines

Title (de)

Plattformkühlung in Turbomaschinen

Title (fr)

Refroidissement de plateformes de turbomachines

Publication

EP 1008723 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811219 A

Priority

EP 98811219 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves passing coolant fluid along the line between two immediately adjacent platforms (310,310') in a coolant channel (330) extending along both platforms. The coolant channel runs approximately parallel to the platform surface, at least in some sections of its length. Turbine blades (320) are mounted on the platforms and the channel runs between the blades on a path approximating to the blade profile. An Independent claim is also included for the platforms of a turbine machine, esp. a gas turbine.

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtungen und das erfindungsgemäße Verfahren dienen der Kühlung von Plattformen in Turbomaschinen. Hierzu ist in zwei unmittelbar nebeneinander angeordneten Plattformen 210, 210' mit einer zwischen den Plattformen verlaufenden Trennfuge 211 zumindest ein Kühlkanal 230 längs der Trennfuge 211 angeordnet. Der Kühlkanal 230 verläuft hierbei näherungsweise parallel zur Oberfläche der Plattformen 210, 210'. Bevorzugt ist der Kühlkanal 230 als schlitzförmige Vertiefung in zumindest einer an die Trennfuge 211 angrenzenden Seitenwand ausgebildet. Im Falle der Anordnung von Schaufeln 220, 220' auf den Plattformen 210, 210' verläuft der Kühlkanal 230 zweckmäßig näherungsweise mittig zwischen den Schaufeln. Darüber hinaus weist der Kühlkanal 230 bevorzugt einen dem Schaufelprofilverlauf ähnlichen Verlauf auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; F01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F01D 11/008 (2013.01); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008723 A1 20000614; EP 1008723 B1 20040218; DE 59810806 D1 20040325; US 6309175 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810806

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810806

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810806

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59810806

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810806

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810806

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810806 P 20040325

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020716

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI