Global patent index - EP 1008727 A2

EP 1008727 A2 2000-06-14 - Cooling in gas turbines

Title (en)

Cooling in gas turbines

Title (de)

Kühlung in Gasturbinen

Title (fr)

Refroidissement de turbines à gaz

Publication

EP 1008727 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811112 A

Priority

DE 19856199 A

Abstract (en)

A component (210) of esp. a gas turbine has cooling bores (240) for a coolant. The bores have the same cross sections and are positioned at different relative distances. The relative distance are smaller in an area of high static pressure (234) of the fluid flow, than in areas of lower static pressure. The component is a platform, and a blade (211) is positioned on the platform downstream of the coolant bores. Static pressure variations are caused by varying the coolant flow volume.

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtungen und die erfindungsgemäßen Verfahren dienen der effizienten und zuverlässigen Kühlung von Bauteilen 210 insbesondere in Turbomaschinen auch im Falle einer lokalen Erhöhung des statischen Drucks 234 eines heißen Fluids, das das Bauteil überströmt. Um eine ausreichende Kühlung der Bauteile 210 zu gewährleisten, ist erfindungsgemäß der Abstand der Kühlbohrungen 240 untereinander jeweils so gewählt, daß die Kühlbohrungen 240 in dem Bereich erhöhten statischen Druckes 234 des heissen Fluides einen kleineren Abstand zueinander aufweisen als in den Bereichen niedrigeren statischen Druckes. Eine typische Ausführung der Erfindung ist in Figur 3 dargestellt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/12; F01D 5/18; F02C 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/186 (2013.01); F01D 25/12 (2013.01); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01); F05D 2260/202 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856199 A1 20000608; EP 1008727 A2 20000614; EP 1008727 A3 20031119; US 6276897 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status

2008-03-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20080104

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040510

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI