Global Patent Index - EP 1008733 A2

EP 1008733 A2 2000-06-14 - Oil-cooled cylinder head

Title (en)

Oil-cooled cylinder head

Title (de)

Ölgekühlter Zylinderkopf

Title (fr)

Culasse refroidie à l'huile

Publication

EP 1008733 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123616 A

Priority

DE 19857458 A

Abstract (en)

A second return line (8b) roughly parallel to the first return line (8a) connects to the cooling space (12d) of the last cylinder and runs along the output shaft valve seals without entry or branching of the channel. The cylinder cooling spaces are formed in spectacles shape on the head ajdoining the cylinder and the two return lines (8a,8b) merge in the crankcase or oil sump. A central cooling channel runs between the cylinder head cooling spaces (12a-12d) and the return lines and in this variant follows a zee trajectory from one end of the engine to the other so as to enclose the inlet channels.

Abstract (de)

Eine solche Brennkraftmaschine mit einem derartigen Zylinderkopf ist bezüglich des Kühlsystems so ausgelegt, daß bei einer maximal vorgesehenen Leistung diese insbesondere im Bereich Kolben, Zylinder und Zylinderkopf zuverlässig gekühlt wird. Das Kühlsystem einer derartigen ölgekühlten Brennkraftmaschine wird in der Form weitergebildet, daß eine noch effektivere Kühlung, insbesondere des Zylinderkopfes 1 auch bei weiterer Leistungssteigerung der Brennkraftmaschine gewährleistet ist. Dies wird dadurch erreicht, daß eine zweite Rückflußleitung 8b zumindest angenähert parallel zu einer ersten Rückflußleitung 8a im Zylinderkopf 1 angeordnet und mit dem endseitigen Zylinderkopfkühlraum 12d verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 3/02; F01M 1/02; F02F 1/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/36 (2006.01); F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 1/40 (2006.01); F01P 3/00 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01); F02B 75/18 (2006.01); F02B 75/20 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/40 (2013.01); F01P 3/02 (2013.01); F02F 1/36 (2013.01); F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F01P 2003/006 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02B 75/20 (2013.01); F02B 2075/1816 (2013.01); F02B 2275/34 (2013.01); F02F 2001/104 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008733 A2 20000614; EP 1008733 A3 20001206; EP 1008733 B1 20030813; DE 19857458 A1 20000615

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906579 P 20030918

2003-08-19 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020826

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI