Global Patent Index - EP 1008742 A1

EP 1008742 A1 2000-06-14 - Method to control an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Method to control an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1008742 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403015 A

Priority

FR 9815485 A

Abstract (en)

Internal combustion engines known as common rail share an integrated very high pressure fuel supply and protection from leaks may be provided by a monitoring unit which compares measured pressure with a threshold and signals leaks or potential leaks to applications programs and a fault memory. Under leak conditions the driver is warned, then the engine power is diminished for a period before being stopped altogether

Abstract (fr)

Procédé de contrôle d'un moteur à combustion interne d'un véhicule, dans lequel la détection d'un risque de fuite provoque le déclenchement d'un moyen d'alerte du conducteur, une limitation des performances du moteur, et un arrêt différé du moteur.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/22 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008742 A1 20000614; EP 1008742 B1 20040317; DE 69915570 D1 20040422; DE 69915570 T2 20050224; FR 2786813 A1 20000609; FR 2786813 B1 20010112

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69915570

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-09-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-06-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040628

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915570 P 20040422

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI