Global Patent Index - EP 1008748 A3

EP 1008748 A3 2000-12-20 - Axial piston machine

Title (en)

Axial piston machine

Title (de)

Axialkolbenmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à pistons axiaux

Publication

EP 1008748 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99124139 A

Priority

DE 19857366 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1008748A2] The axial reciprocating motor has a control disk (19) at the cylinder drum which is moved to swing on a lateral plane (E), with a curved surface. At least one holder section (32) is at the mounting wall (22) with a shoulder surface (33) in a curvature parallel to the mounting sliding surface (21). It extends into the angular range which includes the center axis (7a) of the control disk (19) in the outwards and inwards swung positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20; F04B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/328 (2013.01); F04B 1/2042 (2013.01); F04B 1/2071 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008748 A2 20000614; EP 1008748 A3 20001220; EP 1008748 B1 20050209; DE 19857366 A1 20000629; DE 19857366 C2 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120102

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111203

2012-09-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120831

2012-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111202

2012-07-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110107

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-02-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051110

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911593 P 20050317

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-02-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031013

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/20 A, 7F 04B 1/32 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI