Global Patent Index - EP 1008749 A2

EP 1008749 A2 2000-06-14 - Axial piston machine

Title (en)

Axial piston machine

Title (de)

Axialkolbenmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à pistons axiaux

Publication

EP 1008749 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124140 A

Priority

DE 19857082 A

Abstract (en)

The axial reciprocating motor has an additional spring (30) on the cylinder drum (7). The spring (30) has a progressive spring characteristic with a spring force on the cylinder drum (7) towards the control body (15) with an over-proportional increase, on the spring path, to push the cylinder drum (7) against the control body (15). The additional spring is a plate spring (30).

Abstract (de)

Eine Axialkolbenmaschine (1) weist eine drehbar gelagerte Welle (3) und eine an der Welle (3) angeordnete Zylindertrommel (7) auf. In der Zylindertrommel (7) sind Kolben (9) in Zylindern (8) verschiebbar, die sich über Gleitschuhe an einer Schrägscheibe abstützen. Ferner sind eine an den Gleitschuhen (10) angreifende Rückzugeinrichtung und ein Steuerkörper (15) zum zyklischen Verbinden der zylinder (8) mit Druckleitungen vorgesehen. Eine erste Feder (21) ist zwischen der Zylindertrommel (7) und der Rückzugeinrichtung eingespannt, um gleichzeitig die Zylindertrommel (7) gegen den Steuerkörper (15) und die Gleitschuhe gegen die Schrägscheibe vorzuspannen. Zusätzlich ist eine auf die Zylindertrommel (7) einwirkende zweite Feder (30) mit einer progressiven Kennlinie derart vorgesehen, daß die von der zweiten Feder (30) auf die Zylindertrommel (7) in Richtung auf den Steuerkörper (15) ausgeübte Federkraft mit dem Federweg, in die zweite Feder (30) bei einer Verschiebung der Zylindertrommel (7) gegen den Steuerkörper (15) erfährt, überproportional zunimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008749 A2 20000614; EP 1008749 A3 20001206; EP 1008749 B1 20050302; DE 19857082 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911692 P 20050407

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031024

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI