Global patent index - EP 1008777 A2

EP 1008777 A2 2000-06-14 - Tripod type constant velocity universal joint

Title (en)

Tripod type constant velocity universal joint

Title (de)

Gleichlauf-Universalgelenk mit drei Zapfen

Title (fr)

Joint universel homocinétique à tripode

Publication

EP 1008777 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00101847 A

Priority

  • EP 97901808 A
  • JP 1910696 A
  • JP 34761296 A
  • JP 34764796 A
  • JP 34765596 A

Abstract (en)

A tripod type constant velocity universal joint has an outer member (1) having three axially extending track grooves (2) formed in an inner circumferential surface thereof, each of the track grooves having roller guide surfaces on a pair of opposing side walls thereof. A tripod member (4) has three radially projecting trunnions (5). Rollers (7) are rotatably carried on the trunnions (5), respectively, through a series of cylindrical rolling elements (6), the rollers (7) being accommodated in the track grooves (2) respectively, so that the rollers (7) are movably axially of the outer member (1) with each said roller (7) rolling along one of the opposing roller guide surfaces. Each said roller (7) with an annular projection at an end thereof and a sereis of said rolling elements (6) retained along an inner periphery of said roller (7) form an assembly capable of preventing said rolling elements (6) from dispersing even before said assembly is mounted on a respective trunnion (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 3/205

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 3/205 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 3/2055 (2013.01); F16D 2003/2026 (2013.01); Y10S 464/905 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 5989124 A 19991123; AU 1557597 A 19970828; DE 69733180 D1 20050609; DE 69733180 T2 20060202; DE 69737661 D1 20070606; DE 69737661 T2 20080103; EP 0836023 A1 19980415; EP 0836023 A4 19990407; EP 0836023 B1 20050504; EP 1008777 A2 20000614; EP 1008777 A3 20000621; EP 1008777 B1 20070425; TW 486552 B 20020511; WO 9729294 A1 19970814

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080128

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69737661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-06-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0836023

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-04-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GOTO, TATUHIRO

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SAITO, TSUYOSHI

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OZAWA, MASAHIRO

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NAGATANI, HARUO

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 16D 3/205 A, 7F 16C 43/06 B

2000-06-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 836023

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT