Global patent index - EP 1008800 A2

EP 1008800 A2 2000-06-14 - Headlamp

Title (en)

Headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer

Title (fr)

Phare

Publication

EP 1008800 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123874 A

Priority

DE 19857439 A

Abstract (en)

The headlight has a reflector (2) holding a light source to form a light beam convergent in a focal plane (7) of the reflector, an arrangement for shading part of the beam and a light body (4) for producing a given light distribution. The light body is elongated in the light propagation direction to form a light guide element (10) and a lens element (11) with a curved light outlet surface after the guide element. A light input surface (8) of the guide element is placed near the focal point of the lens element and the reflector's focal plane.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf einen Scheinwerfer (1) nach dem Projektionsprinzip bestehend aus einem Reflektor (2) und einer von dem Reflektor (2) eingefaßten Lichtquelle (3) zur Bildung eines in einer Brennebene (7) des Reflektors (2) konvergierenden Lichtbündels und aus einem in Lichtausbreitungsrichtung (16) nachgeordneten Mittel zum Abschatten eines Teils des Lichtbündels sowie einem Lichtkörper (4) zur Erzeugung einer fortgehenden Lichtverteilung, wobei der Lichtkörper (4) in Lichtausbreitungsrichtung (16) langgestreckt ausgebildet ist unter Bildung eines Lichtführungselementes (10) und eines in Lichtausbreitungsrichtung (16) nachgeordneten Linsenelementes (11), wobei eine Lichtaustrittsfläche (19) des Linsenelementes (11) bogenförmig ausgebildet ist und wobei eine Lichteintrittsfläche (8) des Lichtführungselementes (10) in einem zum Brennpunkt (f2) des Linsenelementes (11) und zu der Brennebene (7) des Reflektors (2) nahen Bereich angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1241 (2013.01); F21S 48/1233 (2013.01); F21S 48/1358 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008800 A2 20000614; EP 1008800 A3 20011017; EP 1008800 B1 20041013; DE 19857439 A1 20000615; ES 2230788 T3 20050501

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-01-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2230788

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910823

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-09-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI