Global patent index - EP 1008804 A3

EP 1008804 A3 2000-07-26 - Device for connecting a pipe to a gas valve outlet port

Title (en)

Device for connecting a pipe to a gas valve outlet port

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Rohrs an einer Austrittsöffnung eines Gasventils

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un tuyau à un orifice de sortie d'une soupape à gaz

Publication

EP 1008804 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99123882 A

Priority

DE 29821843 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1008804A2] The basic element (15) has a U-shaped arm on each of two opposite facing first sides. The arms fit into matching guides (26) on the gas valve (12). The basic element has a cavity (20) which is open on a second side at right angles to the first sides. Near a third side facing the second side, the basic element as a barbed anchor element (23) fitting into a matching cavity (31,32) in the gas valve. The cavity encloses the pipe (10) on one side and covers a radially extending ridge(30) on the pipe on the other side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/46; F16L 37/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2013.01); F23D 2213/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821843 U1 19990218; EP 1008804 A2 20000614; EP 1008804 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status

2003-02-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020325

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 23D 14/46 A, 7F 16L 37/14 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI