Global Patent Index - EP 1008806 A3

EP 1008806 A3 2001-03-07 - High temperature resistant grate bar

Title (en)

High temperature resistant grate bar

Title (de)

Hochtemperaturbeständiger Roststab

Title (fr)

Barreau de grille de combustion résistant aux températures élevées

Publication

EP 1008806 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99811098 A

Priority

DE 19857416 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1008806A2] A high temperature grate bar has a layer (3) of ceramic elements (5) embedded in the interspaces (6) of a metallic mesh frame structure (4). Preferred Features: The ceramic elements (5) comprise hydraulically or chemically bonded aluminum oxide, chromium oxide, silicon carbide, silicon nitride, silicon dioxide or their mixtures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23H 17/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/00 (2006.01); F23H 7/08 (2006.01); F23H 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23H 7/08 (2013.01); F23H 17/12 (2013.01); F23H 2700/009 (2013.01); F23H 2900/17001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008806 A2 20000614; EP 1008806 A3 20010307; DE 19857416 A1 20000615; JP 2000179825 A 20000627; KR 20000048079 A 20000725; NO 996122 A 20000613; NO 996122 D0 19991210; TW 432186 B 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040626

2002-12-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI