Global patent index - EP 1008810 A2

EP 1008810 A2 2000-06-14 - Household apparatus with a control element movable in two directions

Title (en)

Household apparatus with a control element movable in two directions

Title (de)

Haushaltgerät mit zweidimensional bewegbarem Bedienelement

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager avec un élément de commande mobile dans deux directions

Publication

EP 1008810 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123326 A

Priority

DE 19854576 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19854576A1] The joystick (21-24) can be moved in any direction, limited to two degrees of freedom, to reach any point within the limits of movement. Individual functions of the appliance, in kind and degree, are determined by movement to set end points. An Independent claim is included for corresponding equipment.

Abstract (de)

Zum Einstellen eines Betriebszustandes eines Gargerätes (10), einer Waschmaschine, eines Wäschetrockners, einer Geschirrspülmaschine, eines Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerätes, einer Küchenmaschine oder einer Kaffeemaschine aus einer vorgegebenen Menge von voneinander verschiedenen, auswählbaren Betriebszuständen werden a) wenigstens ein Bedienelement (2,21 bis 24) innerhalb eines vorgegebenen Raumbereichs mit wenigstens zwei Bewegungsfreiheitsgraden bewegt, a) den auswählbaren Betriebszuständen Einstellpositionen (Eij, E1 bis E4) des wenigstens einen Bedienelements innerhalb des vorgegebenen Raumbereichs zugeordnet, wobei das Bedienelement zwischen wenigstens zwei der Einstellpositionen nur unter Ausnutzung beider Bewegungsfreiheitsgrade bewegt werden kann, und b) ein Betriebszustand eingestellt, wenn das wenigstens eine Bedienelement in die zugehörige Einstellposition gebracht wurde. Vorteil: Reduzierung der Zahl der Bedienelemente <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/00 (2006.01); F24C 7/08 (2006.01); H01H 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/005 (2013.01); F24C 7/083 (2013.01); H01H 25/00 (2013.01); H01H 2300/054 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19854576 A1 20000316; EP 1008810 A2 20000614; EP 1008810 A3 20040128; EP 1008810 B1 20041020; ES 2232066 T3 20050516

INPADOC legal status

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910894

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101123

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2232066

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910894

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040209

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI