Global Patent Index - EP 1008812 A1

EP 1008812 A1 2000-06-14 - Flow-through member for an expansion tank

Title (en)

Flow-through member for an expansion tank

Title (de)

Durchflusselement für Ausdehnungsgefäss

Title (fr)

Element d'écoulement pour vase d'expansion

Publication

EP 1008812 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204167 A

Priority

NL 1010744 A

Abstract (en)

A flow-through member (1) which is suitable for being positioned in a connecting passage of an expansion tank in order to define a first flow-through passage (30) and a second flow-through passage (40) comprises a basic part (1a), by means of which the flow-through member (1) can be secured in the connecting passage, and a flow-guidance element (14) which is movably connected to the basic part (1a) and has an inlet opening (8) which can direct itself towards the upstream direction of a flow which is present in the flow passage 50 at least during operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 3/1041 (2013.01); F24D 3/1008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008812 A1 20000614; EP 1008812 B1 20030625; DE 69909043 D1 20030731; DE 69909043 T2 20040519; NL 1010744 C2 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909043 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI