Global Patent Index - EP 1008814 A1

EP 1008814 A1 2000-06-14 - AIR OUTLET STRUCTURE OF AIR CONDITIONERS

Title (en)

AIR OUTLET STRUCTURE OF AIR CONDITIONERS

Title (de)

LUFTAUSLASSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE SORTIE POUR CONDITIONNEURS D'AIR

Publication

EP 1008814 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931046 A

Priority

  • JP 9803103 W
  • JP 21505897 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides an air outlet structure for air conditioners which enables air conditioning to be performed so that the room temperature distribution becomes uniform while any draft feeling is eliminated, without involving the swing function of flaps. In a casing, are provided a turbofan (3) whose axis is positioned along a back-and-forth direction and which blows off air, which has been sucked from the front side, radially outwardly with respect to the axis, and a heat exchanger (5) disposed in the casing on the front side of the turbofan (3). The casing has outlets (21, 22, 23, 24) for blowing off air, which has been blown off from the turbofan (3), in upper and lower, right and left directions. The ranging distance of air blown off from the upper outlet (21) is larger than ranging distances of air blown off from the lower, right and left outlets (22, 23, 24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/00 (2011.01); F24F 13/06 (2006.01); F24F 13/14 (2006.01); F24F 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0014 (2013.01); F24F 1/0007 (2013.01); F24F 1/0011 (2013.01); F24F 1/0022 (2013.01); F24F 13/06 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008814 A1 20000614; EP 1008814 A4 20030507; EP 1008814 B1 20051012; CN 1155779 C 20040630; CN 1272912 A 20001108; ES 2251089 T3 20060416; HK 1032620 A1 20050225; JP 2947236 B2 19990913; JP H1163546 A 19990305; TW 377394 B 19991221; WO 9908050 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100711

2011-08-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100710

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090804

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090710

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251089 T3

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2003-05-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030324

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT