Global Patent Index - EP 1008819 A2

EP 1008819 A2 2000-06-14 - Hot water generator for operation at low temperature

Title (en)

Hot water generator for operation at low temperature

Title (de)

Niedrigtemperatur-Warmwassergenerator

Title (fr)

Générateur d'eau chaude pour fonctionnement à faible température

Publication

EP 1008819 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99500235 A

Priority

ES 9802575 A

Abstract (en)

A hot water generator for operation at low temperature, of the pyrotubular type with a pressurized furnace and two stages of combustion gases. Among the generator's components there is a tubular bundle made up of steam pipes (TH) through which the combustion gases circulate, and enveloping pipes (TE) with a diameter greater than that of the steam pipes (TH) and mounted concentrically with respect to the said steam pipes (TH). Helicoidal gas turbulators (TG) travel through the inside of the steam pipes (TH) and have an external diameter equal to the internal diameter of the steam pipes (TH). The function of these gas turbulators (TG) is to put the combustion products into a turbulent state, thus obtaining a greater exchange between the gases and the exchange surfaces. It also has a double wall (DFT) situated between the steam box (CH) and the external rear wall (FT), as well as a deflector (D) which makes the circulating water move in a zig-zag. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 1/28 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01); F24H 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0026 (2013.01); F24H 1/285 (2013.01); F24H 9/0036 (2013.01); F24H 1/263 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008819 A2 20000614; EP 1008819 A3 20020925; ES 2156689 A1 20010701; ES 2156689 B1 20020201; ES 2237230 A1 20050716; ES 2237230 B1 20070501

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051228

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040513

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030324

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI