Global Patent Index - EP 1008947 A1

EP 1008947 A1 2000-06-14 - Method of bringing an air traffic service unit into use

Title (en)

Method of bringing an air traffic service unit into use

Title (de)

Verfahren für den Einsatz eines Servicegeräts für den Luftverkehr

Title (fr)

Procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une unité de service de trafic air

Publication

EP 1008947 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403069 A

Priority

FR 9815690 A

Abstract (en)

An operating system manages entry and exit, software and material resource use, a sequence and clocking of applications, in which one uses mechanisms of inhibiting a memory, and other for cutting-off a central unit. One filters maintains the operating system such as an airline operational communication (AOC) type to forbid other applications to disrupt an operation of the air traffic unit.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de mise en oeuvre de l'unité de service de trafic air (ATSU) qui gère les liaisons entre certains équipements avion et les moyens de communications sol/bord, et dont le système d'exploitation (OS) gère les entrées/sorties, l'utilisation des ressources logicielles et matérielles, l'enchaînement et le cadencement des applications, qui sont des programmes réalisant des fonctionnalités du système avion, dans lequel on utilise des mécanismes de découpage de la mémoire, et des mécanismes de découpage de l'unité centrale ; dans lequel on filtre les appels au système d'exploitation de manière à interdire auxdites applications de type AOC (Airline Operational Communication) de perturber le fonctionnement de ladite unité de service de trafic air. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B64D 47/00 (2006.01); G06F 7/00 (2006.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01); G08G 5/00 (2006.01); H04L 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 99/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] FR 2748145 A1 19971031 - SEXTANT AVIONIQUE [FR]
  • [A] VASUDEVAN N ET AL: "Migrating DSR to a POSIX-compliant platform: lessons learned", 41ST ANNUAL AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL ASSOCIATION CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF 41ST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL PROGRAM AND EXHIBITION OF THE AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL ASSOCIATION, NASHVILLE, TN, USA, 13-17 OCT. 1996, 1996, Arlington, VA, USA, Air Traffic Control Assoc, USA, pages 184 - 189, XP002113402
  • [A] UBNOSKE M J ET AL: "Use of COTS software products to manage air traffic control systems", 41ST ANNUAL AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL ASSOCIATION CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF 41ST ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL PROGRAM AND EXHIBITION OF THE AIR TRAFFIC CONTROL ASSOCIATION, NASHVILLE, TN, USA, 13-17 OCT. 1996, 1996, Arlington, VA, USA, Air Traffic Control Assoc, USA, pages 36 - 40, XP002113403
  • [A] BRITTEN P D ET AL: "Implementation of OSI compliant aircraft communication systems", FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SATELLITE SYSTEMS FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AND NAVIGATION (CONF. PUBL.NO.424), FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SATELLITE SYSTEMS FOR MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS AND NAVIGATION (CONF. PUBL.NO.424), LONDON, UK, 13-15 MAY, 1996, London, UK, IEE, UK, pages 40 - 43, XP002113404, ISBN: 0-85296-658-X

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008947 A1 20000614; CA 2291865 A1 20000611; CA 2291865 C 20090407; FR 2787269 A1 20000616; FR 2787269 B1 20010302; US 6275767 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-26 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0050300000

- Effective date: 20150119

2015-01-19 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0050300000

2014-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140701

2009-12-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS OPERATIONS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070103

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIRBUS FRANCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUROPEAN AERONAUTIC DEFENCE AND SPACE COMPANY - EA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI