Global patent index - EP 1008962 A2

EP 1008962 A2 2000-06-14 - Apparatus for entering and displaying user information on a display

Title (en)

Apparatus for entering and displaying user information on a display

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Eingabe und Anzeige von Benutzerinformationen auf einem Display

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'entrée et l'affichage d'informations de l'utilisateur sur un dispositif d'affichage

Publication

EP 1008962 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250402 A

Priority

DE 29821903 U

Abstract (en)

The user panel has an input field (I) that is subdivided into a number of sectors (I-1 to I-4). The first sector has a number of soft keys (S1-S5) that allow a number of basic menus to be selected. The second section allows sub menus to be called and the third is used for display activation. Numerical values are entered using the fourth one. A home key is provided for return to show the franking data on the display panel (O).

Abstract (de)

Die Anordnung zur Eingabe und Anzeige von Benutzerinformationen auf einem Display hat unterhalb letzteren eine Eingabeeinheit (I) mit einer Anzahl an Eingabefeldern (I-1, I-2, I-3 und I-4) angeordnet. Über Bedienelemente (Grundmenütasten) des ersten Eingabefeldes (I-1) werden Grundmenüs ausgewählt, von denen ausgehend per Softkey ein Submenü einstellbar ist. Das zweite Eingabefeld (I-2) enthält die Softkeys (S1-S5). Das dritte Eingabefeld (I-3) ist für eine alternative Auswahl der Menüs bzw. Listenbilder und das vierte Eingabefeld (I-4) ist für eine Zifferneingabe vorgesehen. Die Anzeigeeinheit (O) ist ein großflächiges Display, mit welchem Schirmbilder mit Anzeigefeldern dargestellt werden, wobei ein erstes Anzeigefeld mindestens eine Statuszeile mit Anzeige der Eingabe in einem Editierfeld umfaßt, ein zweites Anzeigefeld Optionen und Hinweise anzeigt und ein weiteres Anzeigefeld als Funktionsbezeichnungsfeld für die Softkeys dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0029 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01); G09G 2320/0606 (2013.01); G09G 2320/066 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29821903 U1 19990506; DE 59914563 D1 20080110; EP 1008962 A2 20000614; EP 1008962 A3 20001108; EP 1008962 B1 20071128

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59914563

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2008-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-02-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914563

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-01-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2007-11-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010215

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/02 A, 7G 07B 17/00 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI