Global Patent Index - EP 1008968 A2

EP 1008968 A2 2000-06-14 - Gaming machine

Title (en)

Gaming machine

Title (de)

Spielautomat

Title (fr)

Machine de jeu

Publication

EP 1008968 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99124082 A

Priority

  • JP 35101598 A
  • JP 36038298 A
  • JP 31232499 A
  • JP 32197399 A
  • JP 34020199 A

Abstract (en)

In a gaming machine (1) comprising a variable display device (5a to 5c) for variably displaying a plurality of kinds of symbols necessary for gaming, a starting device (20) for starting variably displaying the symbols, and a stopping device (21), disposed so as to be operable by a player, for stopping the symbols being variably displayed, wherein the player is provided with a profit if a combination of symbols displayed when the symbols are stopped constitutes a predetermined winning mode; an image display section (13) for displaying game information to the player is provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3227 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); G07F 17/3267 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008969 A2 20000614; EP 1008969 A3 20020724; EP 1008968 A2 20000614; EP 1008968 A3 20020710

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI