Global Patent Index - EP 1008970 A1

EP 1008970 A1 2000-06-14 - CYCLIC VISOR FOR RECREATIONAL MACHINES

Title (en)

CYCLIC VISOR FOR RECREATIONAL MACHINES

Title (de)

ZYKLISCHER SICHTSCHIRM FÜR SPIELAUTOMATEN

Title (fr)

VISIONNEUSES CYCLIQUES POUR MACHINES DE JEUX

Publication

EP 1008970 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97935577 A

Priority

  • ES 9700208 W
  • ES 9700295 A

Abstract (en)

It consists of a dihedral support (7) equipped with a large circular window (8), extended through the two faces of the support (7), immediately behind which is established a disc (1), of flexible transparent or translucid plastic, provided at its circumference with an alignment of images (2), participating in the machine game, such that said disc (1) is retained by the support (7) across its circumference, being interlocked through its center to the shaft (3) of an electric motor, preferably a step to step synchronous motor, suitably controlled by means of, for example, a phototransmitter-receiver, such that in the rotational movement of said motor, supplied to the image carrying disc (1), said disc permanently maintains a dihedral configuration, due to its flexible nature, showing the observer an alignment of images (2) according to a circumference arc of variable amplitude, according to the level of concealment of the front face of the assembly. The disc is susceptible of also being applicable to several machines, permitting that in all of them, the corresponding images are offered, through their respective windows arranged in the front of each one of the machines. If the disc is applicable to several machines simultaneously, it should be equipped with two bracings near and parallel to each one of its diameters, to determine two almost semicircular sectors, one in the front and the other in the rear, whilst across the intermediate sector the assembly is installed over the corresponding furniture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9836389A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008970 A1 20000614; WO 9836389 A1 19980820; ZA 9707107 B 19980511

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20011103

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010504

2001-05-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CYCLIC VIEWER FOR RECREATIONAL MACHINES

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990903

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE