Global patent index - EP 1008976 A2

EP 1008976 A2 2000-06-14 - Device for receiving a price and/or product related information

Title (en)

Device for receiving a price and/or product related information

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufnahme von Preis- und/oder Produktinformation

Title (fr)

Dispositif destiné à recevoir un support de prix et/ou d'information concernant le produit

Publication

EP 1008976 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117106 A

Priority

DE 19857189 A

Abstract (en)

The price and product information cassette (2) is clipped into a slide (3) which in action is completely enclosed in a case (7) and the slide is divided up by stays (5) forming the price and/or information (4) compartments (6). The case should be made of transparent material on the display side and closed off at the sides by end caps (8) whose fitted pins (10) engage conformably allotted holes (9) in the case. The case has fasteners at the rear to fix the case to the shelf edge. Both case and slide are die cast components.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (1) zur Aufnahme von Preis- und/oder Produktinformation. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zugrunde, eine Vorrichtung (1) vorzuschlagen, die eine Preiskassette (2), insbesondere eine elektronische Preiskassette, vor Verschmutzung, Feuchtigkeit und Beschädigung schützt. Die Aufgabe wird dadurch gelöst, daß die Vorrichtung (1) aus einem Köcher (7) und einem Einschubelement (3) besteht, daß das Einschubelement (3) derart ausgestaltet ist, daß es eine Kassette (2) aufnimmt, die Preis- und/oder Produktinformation anzeigt und daß der Köcher (7) das Einschubelement (3) im Gebrauchszustand vollständig umschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/204 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008976 A2 20000614; EP 1008976 A3 20010110; EP 1008976 B1 20050112; AT 287116 T 20050115; DE 19857189 A1 20000615; ES 2235414 T3 20050701

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-09-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59911442

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070827

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2235414

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911442

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/20 A

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR RECEIVING A PRICE AND/OR PRODUCT RELATED INFORMATION

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 09F 3/20 A

2004-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR RECEIVING A PRICE AND/OR PRODUCT RELATED INFORMATION

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI