Global Patent Index - EP 1008996 A2

EP 1008996 A2 2000-06-14 - Cable with a core, an outer jacket and a rip cord

Title (en)

Cable with a core, an outer jacket and a rip cord

Title (de)

Kabel mit einer Kabelseele, einem Kabelmantel und einem Reissfaden

Title (fr)

Câble avec un noyau, une gaine externe et une corde de déchirure

Publication

EP 1008996 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124422 A

Priority

DE 19856814 A

Abstract (en)

A cable with a cable core, a cable sheath (4,5) and at least one intermediate tear or rupture thread (2,3) fixed in position by means of at least one auxiliary yarn (8,9). At least two rupture threads (2,3) are provided and are specifically arranged equidistantly around the cable core, with each rupture thread (2,3) entwined by one or more auxiliary yarn(s) (8,9) provided as a braid or knitted fabric, esp. of the KEMAFIL (RTM) type.

Abstract (de)

Kabel mit einer Kabelseele, einem Kabelmantel und zumindest einem zwischengelagerten Reißfaden, wobei der Reißfaden mittels zumindest eines Hilfsgarnes positionsmäßig fixiert ist, sowie Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/385 (2013.01); D07B 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1008996 A2 20000614; EP 1008996 A3 20001206; DE 19856814 A1 20000615; US 6314855 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010605

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI