Global Patent Index - EP 1009004 A1

EP 1009004 A1 2000-06-14 - Control device for an electromagnet, with detection of accidental movement of the movable core of the electromagnet

Title (en)

Control device for an electromagnet, with detection of accidental movement of the movable core of the electromagnet

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Steuerung eines Elektromagneten, mit Erfassung von unbeabsichtigtem Bewegen des beweglichen Kerns eines Elektromagneten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'un électro-aimant, avec détection d'un déplacement intempestif du noyau mobile de l'électro-aimant

Publication

EP 1009004 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410161 A

Priority

FR 9815554 A

Abstract (en)

The electromagnet command activates a moving hub with an active call phase, during which a call current is received and a maintenance phase during which a lower maintenance current is sent out. The command mechanism can detect sudden hub movement during the maintenance phase as a function of current value (1b) circulating in the coil by finding the current value above a set level (lcm). If the level is exceeded, then the command passes to the call phase passing a much larger current level.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif comporte des moyens de détection d'un déplacement intempestif du noyau mobile de l'électro-aimant pendant une phase de maintien. Pour cela, un circuit de commande et de régulation surveille le courant (Ib) circulant dans au moins une bobine de l'électro-aimant. Lorsque, pendant une phase de maintien, le courant (Ib) circulant dans la bobine est supérieur à une valeur de consigne (Icm) et soit le reste pendant une durée prédéterminée (t4-t6) soit est croissant, alors un déplacement intempestif est considéré comme détecté et le dispositif fait passer l'électro-aimant en phase d'appel avec un courant (Ica) beaucoup plus élevé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/00 (2006.01); H01H 47/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/002 (2013.01); H01H 47/325 (2013.01); H01H 2047/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009004 A1 20000614; EP 1009004 B1 20040107; DE 69914053 D1 20040212; DE 69914053 T2 20041014; FR 2786915 A1 20000609; FR 2786915 B1 20010112; US 6317308 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121116

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-12-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914053 P 20040212

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI