Global Patent Index - EP 1009013 A2

EP 1009013 A2 2000-06-14 - Lamp with uncemented base

Title (en)

Lamp with uncemented base

Title (de)

Kittlos gesockelte Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe munie d'un culot sans ciment

Publication

EP 1009013 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124409 A

Priority

DE 19856871 A

Abstract (en)

One end of glass bulb is sealed by pinched section (2) which has socket attached to it by metal spring. Socket has slot (7) loosely fitted to seal. Spring is U-shaped and grips seal, with one spring leg (12) parallel to longitudinal axis of bulb and having lateral expansion and tensioned by slot.

Abstract (de)

Ein Lampenkolben (1) aus Glas ist einseitig durch eine Quetschung (2) verschlossen ist. An der Quetschung (2) ist ein Sockel (5) mittels einer Metallfeder (6) befestigt. Der Sockel (5) besitzt eine der Quetschung (2) locker angepaßte Aufnahme (7). Die Metallfeder (6;26) ist U-förmig gebogen und besteht aus einem Basisteil (11) und zwei Schenkeln (12,13), die die Quetschung umgreifen, wobei die Befestigung des Sockels (5) dadurch vermittelt wird, daß ein Schenkel (12) im wesentlichen parallel zur Längsachse ausgerichtet und so gebogen ist, daß er eine Federkraft quer zur Längsachse ausübt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/60; H01K 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/50 (2006.01); H01J 5/60 (2006.01); H01K 1/46 (2006.01); H01R 33/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 5/60 (2013.01); H01J 61/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19856871 A1 20000615; CA 2292136 A1 20000609; DE 59913972 D1 20061221; EP 1009013 A2 20000614; EP 1009013 A3 20000628; EP 1009013 B1 20061108; HU 222799 B1 20031028; HU 9904517 A2 20000628; HU 9904517 A3 20000928; HU 9904517 D0 20000228; JP 2000182735 A 20000630; JP 4347477 B2 20091021; US 6469428 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 80807 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131207

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131207

2014-07-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUH

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LEDVANCE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59913972

- Effective date: 20111130

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070809

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070215

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913972 P 20061221

2006-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061108

2005-04-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050304

2001-04-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FI FR GB IT LI NL

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI