Global patent index - EP 1009017 A2

EP 1009017 A2 2000-06-14 - Fluorescent lamp

Title (en)

Fluorescent lamp

Title (de)

Fluoreszente Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe fluorescente

Publication

EP 1009017 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123778 A

Priority

JP 34626698 A

Abstract (en)

A two-wavelength band light emitting type fluorescent lamp the main light emission of which is obtained by fluorescent substances in which the ranges of the wavelength peak of light emission are located from 470 to 540 nm and from 600 to 650 nm. The fluorescent lamp has light colors located within a range where y is not larger than -0.43x + 0.60 and x is not smaller than 0.16 on xy chromaticity coordinates and having Duv not lower than 5. The fluorescent lamp can perform a categorical identification of colors including at least red, green, blue, yellow and white for surface colors of an object to be illuminated. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/44 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009017 A2 20000614; EP 1009017 A3 20010404; US 2002053868 A1 20020509

INPADOC legal status

2002-05-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020313

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI