Global Patent Index - EP 1009025 A2

EP 1009025 A2 2000-06-14 - Epoxy resin composition for encapsulation of semiconductor devices

Title (en)

Epoxy resin composition for encapsulation of semiconductor devices

Title (de)

Epoxyharzmasse zum Einkapseln von Halbleiterelementen

Title (fr)

Composition de résine époxy pour encapsulation de dispositifs semi-conducteurs

Publication

EP 1009025 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119397 A

Priority

  • JP 34911298 A
  • JP 24852399 A

Abstract (en)

An epoxy resin composition for semiconductor encpsulation, which is excellent in both storage stability and rapid curability, is disclosed. The epoxy resin composition for semiconductor encapsultion comprises (A) an epoxy resin, (B) a phenolic resin, and a combination of (C) a cure accelerator and (D) cure accelerator-containing microcapsules having a core/shell structure in which a cure accelerator as a core is encapsulated in a thermoplastic resin shell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 59/68 (2006.01); C08G 59/18 (2006.01); C08G 59/24 (2006.01); H01L 21/56 (2006.01); H01L 23/29 (2006.01); H01L 23/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/293 (2013.01); C08G 59/188 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12044 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12528 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009025 A2 20000614; EP 1009025 A3 20020828; CN 1238421 C 20060125; CN 1256288 A 20000614; JP 2000230039 A 20000822; KR 100581988 B1 20060523; KR 20000047506 A 20000725; MY 116439 A 20040131; TW 500759 B 20020901; US 6248454 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161207

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060117

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021202

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 23/29 A, 7C 08G 59/18 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI