Global Patent Index - EP 1009060 A2

EP 1009060 A2 2000-06-14 - Contact device for a functional electrical element fitted on glass

Title (en)

Contact device for a functional electrical element fitted on glass

Title (de)

Kontaktvorrichtung für ein auf Glas angeordnetes elektrisches Funktionselement

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contact pour un élément fonctionnel électrique disposé sur une vitre

Publication

EP 1009060 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402988 A

Priority

DE 19856663 A

Abstract (en)

The contact device has a box fixed to the window, with electrical connections on the exterior of box The box contains electrical elements such as an amplifier, with an input connection between the entry to the box and the electrical element, fixed on the window. There is also an output connection. Contact regions on the element are arranged to face corresponding connection areas of the box. These are stuck in position, and make contact via cut-out regions in the contact areas. Contact entry may be via connecting wires.

Abstract (fr)

Dans un dispositif de contact pour un élément fonctionnel électrique, par exemple une antenne, disposé sur une vitre, en particulier sur une vitre de véhicule, avec un boîtier fixé sur la vitre et comportant des composants électriques, comme un amplificateur, avec une connexion d'entrée entre le boîtier et l'élément fonctionnel, également fixée sur la vitre, et avec des raccords de sortie, conformément à l'invention, la connexion d'entrée (104; 204) est, dans deux variantes différentes, chaque fois entourée d'une couche de colle, indépendamment de sa mise en contact électrique; dans une des variantes, elle est disposée à l'extérieur du boîtier (102), dans l'autre variante elle est recouverte par le boîtier (202). Le contact électrique vers l'élément fonctionnel est réalisé lors du ou après le collage du boîtier, respectivement de la connexion d'entrée, de préférence par brasage, afin d'assurer une mise en contact particulièrement fiable. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01R 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 1/00 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01R 4/00 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01); H01R 12/04 (2006.01); H01R 13/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/1271 (2013.01); H01R 13/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009060 A2 20000614; EP 1009060 A3 20030709; BR 9906162 A 20000829; DE 19856663 A1 20000629; DE 19856663 C2 20030403; JP 2000243468 A 20000908; KR 100632272 B1 20061011; KR 20010055145 A 20010704; PL 196141 B1 20071231; PL 337050 A1 20000619; US 6307515 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2009-12-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090701

2004-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040621

2004-05-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01Q 1/12 A

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/20 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/02 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 4/04 B

2003-07-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/405 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI