Global Patent Index - EP 1009066 A2

EP 1009066 A2 2000-06-14 - Connector-latching device

Title (en)

Connector-latching device

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtungsverbinder

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage de connecteur

Publication

EP 1009066 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309907 A

Priority

JP 35230298 A

Abstract (en)

A connector-latching device (70) is described which can be applied even to relatively small connectors and has enough holding force effectively to prevent uncoupling of engaged connectors. It comprises a first member (72) and a second member (73) which are generally wedge-shaped. The first member (72) has an outer surface (74) for engaging a connector (30) and an inner surface (78) which serves as the latching surface and which engages with the second member (73). The latter has an outer surface (75) for engaging the connector and a latching surface (81) which engages with the inner surface (78) of the first member (72). In use, the first member (72) of the device is placed under the locking arm (34) of the connector, after which the second member (73) is pushed in to an adjacent position which results in the first and second members being wedged between opposing walls of the connector housing located on opposite sides of the locking arm. Displacement of the locking arm is thereby prevented. A cover (85) for protecting the locking arm is located on the first member (72). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/639 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6272 (2013.01); H01R 13/639 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009066 A2 20000614; EP 1009066 A3 20001011; JP 2000182715 A 20000630

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011112

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/627 A, 7H 01R 13/639 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI