Global Patent Index - EP 1009114 A3

EP 1009114 A3 2000-07-19 - Receiver for receiving digital broadcast transmissions

Title (en)

Receiver for receiving digital broadcast transmissions

Title (de)

Empfänger für den Empfang von digitalen Rundfunkübertragungen

Title (fr)

Récepteur pour la réception de transmissions de radiodiffusion numérique

Publication

EP 1009114 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99309963 A

Priority

GB 9827108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1009114A2] A digital audio broadcast receiver for receiving at least two broadcast ensembles, each ensemble being made up of a plurality of transmission frames and each transmission frame including an information channel and a time interleaved main service channel. The broadcast receiver includes means for acquiring and processing during a plurality of relatively long periods a given broadcast ensemble to extract and reproduce selected audio or other service data from said main service channel. The means for acquiring and processing is also operable to process a further broadcast ensemble at least to detect the presence thereof during one or more relatively short intervals interspersed with said relatively long periods, thereby to obtain data relating to said further ensemble. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/26 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/22 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] EP 0689307 A1 19951227 - NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0790722 A1 19970820 - SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]
  • [Y] EP 0689308 A1 19951227 - NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]
  • [Y] EP 0801476 A2 19971015 - GRUNDIG AG [DE]
  • [A] "OFFICIAL EBU TECHNICAL TEXTS. ÖEBU STATEMENT D74-1992 EBU EXPECTATIONS FOR FIRST-GENERATION CONSUMER DAB RECEIVERS APPROVED FOR PUBLICATION DECEMBER 1992", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL,BE,EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, no. 255, 1 January 1993 (1993-01-01), pages 57 - 63, XP000354456, ISSN: 0251-0936

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009114 A2 20000614; EP 1009114 A3 20000719; GB 9827108 D0 19990203

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151222

2010-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENSIGMA TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061211

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI