Global Patent Index - EP 1009115 A2

EP 1009115 A2 2000-06-14 - Method for associating a transport stream with a predetermined frequency and implementation of the method in a receiver for digital broadcast transmissions

Title (en)

Method for associating a transport stream with a predetermined frequency and implementation of the method in a receiver for digital broadcast transmissions

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Zuordnen einer bestimmten Empfangsfrequenz zu einem Datenstrom und Anwendung dieses Verfahrens in einem Empfänger für digitale Rundfunkübertragungen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour associer un train numérique de transport avec une fréquence de réception et mise en oeuvre de cette méthode dans un récepteur de radiodiffusion numérique

Publication

EP 1009115 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99402562 A

Priority

  • EP 99402562 A
  • EP 98402766 A

Abstract (en)

A method for determining a predetermined frequency associated with a transport stream in a digital broadcast receiver, comprises scanning (20, 21 ; 26, 27, 28 ; 30, 31) a frequency range, finding (22) a first frequency (FST) at which a first transport stream is received, reading (23) first identifying data (ID) from the first transport stream, which allows to uniquely identify the first transport stream, extracting (24) a first predetermined frequency (F') associated with the first identifying data from a database (25) by using the first identifying data, the database associating a predetermined frequency with predetermined identification data. The method may be used in networks where the actual broadcasting frequency of the transport stream is different from the predetermined frequency of this transport stream, as contained in a network information table. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; H03J 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/25 (2008.01); H04H 60/27 (2008.01); H04H 60/41 (2008.01); H04N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/41 (2013.01); H04H 60/25 (2013.01); H04H 60/27 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009115 A2 20000614; EP 1009115 A3 20051102

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-08-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-07-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04N 5/00 B

2005-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 03J 1/00 B

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI