Global Patent Index - EP 1009170 A2

EP 1009170 A2 2000-06-14 - System, method and apparatus for a variable output video decoder

Title (en)

System, method and apparatus for a variable output video decoder

Title (de)

System, Verfahren und Vorrichtung für einen Videodecoder mit variablem Ausgang

Title (fr)

Système, procédé et dispositif pour décodeur vidéo à sortie variable

Publication

EP 1009170 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99309802 A

Priority

US 20734698 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a system, method and an apparatus for a digital video decoder, which includes a data processor that utilizes at least an encoded video data stream to produce one or more output streams. The one or more output streams includes at least a set of motion compensation instructions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/26 (2006.01); H04N 7/36 (2006.01); H04N 7/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 19/43 (2014.11); H04N 19/44 (2014.11); H04N 19/51 (2013.01); H04N 19/61 (2014.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1009170 A2 20000614; EP 1009170 A3 20040414; EP 1009170 B1 20090415; DE 69940716 D1 20090528; EP 1715696 A2 20061025; EP 1715696 A3 20080319; US 6490324 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090415

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20100118

2009-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69940716

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2009-05-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2009-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-04-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-01-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI