Global Patent Index - EP 1009232 A1

EP 1009232 A1 2000-06-21 - METHODS FOR TREATING INSULIN RESISTANCE AND IDENTIFYING PATIENTS AT RISK FOR THE DISEASE

Title (en)

METHODS FOR TREATING INSULIN RESISTANCE AND IDENTIFYING PATIENTS AT RISK FOR THE DISEASE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER INSULINRESISTENZ UND ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT EINEM RISIKO FÜR DIESE KRANKHEIT

Title (fr)

METHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'INSULINORESISTANCE ET PROCEDES D'IDENTIFICATION DE PATIENTS PRESENTANT CE RISQUE

Publication

EP 1009232 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97953324 A

Priority

  • US 9723481 W
  • US 3450496 P
  • US 3741797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827813A1] The present invention is directed to compositions and methods for treating insulin resistance and for ameliorating pathological conditions associated with insulin resistance. Also disclosed are methods for identifying patients at risk for developing non-insulin dependent diabetes melitis or insulin resistance. Also disclosed are methods for identifying patients at risk for developing or suffering from reactive hypoglycemia and methods of treatment thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 37/18; A61K 38/00; A61K 38/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/27 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/26 (2006.01); G01N 33/564 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/26 (2013.01); A61K 38/27 (2013.01); G01N 33/564 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); G01N 2800/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827813 A1 19980702; AU 5709698 A 19980717; CA 2276149 A1 19980702; EP 1009232 A1 20000621; EP 1009232 A4 20020612; JP 2001508770 A 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-06-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 01N 37/18 A, 7A 61K 38/00 B, 7A 61K 38/28 B, 7A 61K 38/27 B

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUPERGEN, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE