Global Patent Index - EP 1009234 A1

EP 1009234 A1 2000-06-21 - SYNERGISTIC HERBICIDAL COMBINATION

Title (en)

SYNERGISTIC HERBICIDAL COMBINATION

Title (de)

SYNERGISTISCHE HERBIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMBINAISON HERBICIDE SYNERGIQUE

Publication

EP 1009234 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98940400 A

Priority

  • GB 9802574 W
  • US 92278597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911131A1] Control of weeds in a rice crop is obtained by applying to the crop, the weeds, or the locus of either, a herbicidal composition containing molinate and oxyfluorfen in a weight ratio of from about 500:1 to about 30:1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 47/16; A01N 31/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 31/16 (2006.01); A01N 47/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 47/16 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A01N 47/16 + A01N 33/22
  2. A01N 47/16 + A01N 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911131A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911131 A1 19990311; AU 753747 B2 20021024; AU 8873398 A 19990322; BR 9811439 A 20000822; BR 9811439 B1 20100713; CN 1237877 C 20060125; CN 1269700 A 20001011; EA 002152 B1 20011224; EA 200000276 A1 20000828; EP 1009234 A1 20000621; JP 2001514196 A 20010911; MY 116605 A 20040228

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYNGENTA LIMITED

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FRANZ, RICHARD, LYNN

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUA, JEE, MOK

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KHODAYARI, KHOSRO

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000403

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE