Global Patent Index - EP 1009236 A1

EP 1009236 A1 2000-06-21 - EVALUATION OF, DELIVERY OF, AND USE OF AGENTS TO TREAT HEART DISORDERS

Title (en)

EVALUATION OF, DELIVERY OF, AND USE OF AGENTS TO TREAT HEART DISORDERS

Title (de)

EVALUIERUNG, VERABREICHUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON MITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VONHERZERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

EVALUATION DES AGENTS ADAPTES AU TRAITEMENT DE CARDIOPATHIES, ADMINISTRATION ET UTILISATION DE TELS AGENTS

Publication

EP 1009236 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98934656 A

Priority

  • US 9814968 W
  • US 5335697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904636A1] The invention provides methods of evaluating a tratement for a heart disorder. The invention also provides methods of delivering a compound to the heart of a subject. A heart cell, into which has been introduced by somatic gene transfer, a nucleic acid which results in the expression of phospholamban, a heart tissue, into which has been introduced by somatic gene transfer, a nucleic acid which results in the expression of phospholamban and a heart, into which has been introduced by somatic gene transfer, a nucleic acid which results in the expression of phospholamban are also provided by the invention. Finally, the invention provides a method for treating a subject at risk for a heart disorder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A01N 43/04; C07H 21/04; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/64; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 9/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1138 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A01K 2217/075 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/14 (2013.01); C12N 2799/022 (2013.01); C12N 2799/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904636 A1 19990204; WO 9904636 A9 19990429; CA 2297328 A1 19990204; EP 1009236 A1 20000621; EP 1009236 A4 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050826

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011119

2000-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 01N 63/00 A, 7A 01N 43/04 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7C 12N 15/64 B, 7C 12N 5/00 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7G 01N 33/50 B

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000221

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI