Global Patent Index - EP 1009259 A1

EP 1009259 A1 2000-06-21 - METHOD FOR MAKING UPHOLSTERY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING UPHOLSTERY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POLSTERMÖBELS, DANACH HERGESTELLTES POLSTERMÖBEL UND GRUNDGERÜST DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MEUBLE A REMBOURRAGE

Publication

EP 1009259 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952528 A

Priority

  • DE 9802541 W
  • DE 19737647 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19737647A1] The invention relates to upholstery, the base structure of the furniture concerned and its production. The invention seeks a pioneering design to offer various arrangement possibilities and an assembly mode enabling easy recycling. To achieve that objective, the upholstered piece of furniture is made from a base structure which has been dressed so as to give a shape to said piece of furniture. The comfort is provided independently of the dressing by the covering of the base structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 4/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/00 (2006.01); A47C 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 4/028 (2013.01); A47C 4/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911161A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19737647 A1 19990304; AU 1021099 A 19990322; BR 9811425 A 20000822; CA 2302272 A1 19990311; CN 1268876 A 20001004; EA 200000158 A1 20001030; EP 1009259 A1 20000621; IL 134553 D0 20010430; JP 2001514033 A 20010911; NO 20000698 A 20000211; NO 20000698 D0 20000211; TR 200000568 T2 20000721; WO 9911161 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020301

2004-03-31 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20020422

2004-03-31 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-03 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Free text: FESTSTELLUNG EINES RECHTSVERLUSTES (REGEL 69 (1) EPUE) VOM 08.10.2002 AN HERRN KRUSE GERD, KIEFERNSTRASSE 16, 26345 BOCKHORN, DEUTSCHLAND

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020305

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE