Global patent index - EP 1009263 A1

EP 1009263 A1 2000-06-21 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN ELEMENT TO BE SUPPORTED, IN PARTICULAR A PATIENT'S BODY FOR MAINTAINING IT AT A PREDETERMINED WATER LINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPORTING AN ELEMENT TO BE SUPPORTED, IN PARTICULAR A PATIENT'S BODY FOR MAINTAINING IT AT A PREDETERMINED WATER LINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STÜTZEN EINES KÖRPERS, INSBESONDERE EINES PATIENTEN MIT EINER VORGEWÄHLTEN EINSINKTIEFE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SUPPORT D'UN ELEMENT A SUPPORTER, EN PARTICULIER LE CORPS D'UN PATIENT PERMETTANT UN SUPPORT A UNE LIGNE DE FLOTTAISON PREDETERMINEE

Publication

EP 1009263 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 97952969 A

Priority

  • FR 9702376 W
  • FR 9615848 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2757377A1] The invention concerns a supporting method and apparatus for an element to be supported. This apparatus (10) comprises a supporting device (11) including at least a closed chamber or one with controlled outflow (11a), filling (50) or evacuating (52) means of a fluid for filling the chamber and means (21) for measuring the distance (d) separating the upper surface (12) of the chamber from its lower surface (13). The invention is characterised in that it further comprises a device for measuring the reaction of the supporting device (11) relative to the morphological data of the element to be supported (P1 or P2), as well as a control system comprising means (42) for combining the measurement of the penetration distance (d) supplied by the measuring device (20) with the measurement of the reaction supplied by the reaction measuring device (30). This combination advantageously provides a summation of the two results obtained. The invention enables to maintain support substantially at the equilibrium corresponding substantially to a predetermined water line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10; A61G 7/057

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/05 (2006.01); A61G 7/057 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/05769 (2013.01); A61G 2203/34 (2013.01); A61G 2203/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9827849A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2757377 A1 19980626; FR 2757377 B1 19990312; AT 243966 T 20030715; AU 5667698 A 19980717; BR 9714052 A 20000509; CA 2274951 A1 19980702; CA 2274951 C 20060815; DE 69723319 D1 20030807; DE 69723319 T2 20040422; EP 1009263 A1 20000621; EP 1009263 B1 20030702; EP 1009263 B9 20040804; JP 2001506892 A 20010529; JP 2007307393 A 20071129; US 6009580 A 20000104; WO 9827849 A1 19980702

INPADOC legal status

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141222

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69723319

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031013

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69723319

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990623

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL