Global Patent Index - EP 1009268 A1

EP 1009268 A1 2000-06-21 - FORK WITH MOBILE HEAD

Title (en)

FORK WITH MOBILE HEAD

Title (de)

ESSGABEL MIT BEWEGLICHEM KOPF

Title (fr)

FOURCHETTE A TETE MOBILE

Publication

EP 1009268 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98937380 A

Priority

  • CH 9800344 W
  • CH 206597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911166A1] The invention concerns a head (2) mounted free at the fork handle (1) end about an axis of rotation (XR) to enable the handle to rotate relatively to said head (2). Said fork is used for twining spaghetti by fixing the head in the palm of one hand (5) and turning the handle between the fingers of this hand. The mobile head is freely mounted by click-stop fixing means (1B) with screws (23, 53) or by insertion. The handle has several flat side surfaces, in particular a pentagonal profile.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/026 (2013.01); A47G 2400/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911166A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911166 A1 19990311; AU 8620998 A 19990322; DE 69809067 D1 20021205; DE 69809067 T2 20030731; EP 1009268 A1 20000621; EP 1009268 B1 20021030; ES 2186192 T3 20030501

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050818

2004-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030819

2004-06-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030818

2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030819

2003-08-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186192 T3

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809067 20021205

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011219

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI